Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Peachtree Settlement Funding, Llc v. New York Life Insurance Company, New York Life Insurance And Annuity Corporation, Reginald Duchenne
A Special Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Tra) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY. Judge Robert A Onofry presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 11, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 25, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, NY
Category
Special Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Tra)
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Sep 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 21, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: Sep 16, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 1)
Date: Aug 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 1)
Date: Aug 22, 2022PETITION
Date: Aug 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Contract and Disclosure Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A to Petition - Proof of Annuity Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Aug 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Aug 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion 1)
Date: Aug 11, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Aug 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Aug 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Aug 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Aug 11, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 21, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) *approve structured settlement |
||
September 16, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 22, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) *signed |
||
August 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS to OTSC |
||
August 11, 2022 | Petition | ||
August 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Contract and Disclosure Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit B - Contract and Disclosure Redacted |
||
August 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A to Petition - Proof of Annuity Redacted per 22 NYCRR Ex. A to Petition - Proof of Annuity Redacted |
||
August 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Prior Order |
||
August 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Prior Order |
||
August 11, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed OTSC |
||
August 11, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 11, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Statement of Payee |
||
August 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex. B - Statement of Professional Representation |
||
August 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A to Payee Affidavit |