Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SMITH, KIMBERLY vs. GIORDANO, ANTHONY F.
A Sp-Other case was filed in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Catherine M. Bartlett presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 13, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 16, 2021
Filing Location
Orange County, NY
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | hearing |
Denied (Motion #006)
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
February 18, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #006)
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
February 03, 2020 | Motion |
Restore (Motion #006) Decided: 02/26/2020Denied Before Justice: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
November 26, 2019 | hearing |
Denied (Motion #005)
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
October 18, 2019 | Motion |
Vacate - Decision/Order/Judgment/Award (Motion #005) Decided: 01/02/2020Denied Before Justice: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
October 18, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #005)
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
September 19, 2019 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
September 16, 2019 | Motion |
Injunction/Restraining Order (Motion #004) Decided: 09/17/2019Declined to Sign Before Justice: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
September 16, 2019 | hearing |
Declined to Sign (Motion #004)
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
July 10, 2019 | hearing |
Closed
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
June 12, 2019 | hearing |
Granted (Motion #002)
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
June 12, 2019 | hearing |
Denied (Motion #003)
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
May 30, 2019 | hearing |
Held STATUS CNF, 9AM (Conversion) Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
May 29, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003)
Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
May 28, 2019 | Motion |
Amend Caption/Pleadings (Motion #003) Decided: 07/01/2019Denied Before Justice: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
May 23, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #002) Decided: 07/01/2019Granted Before Justice: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
February 28, 2019 | hearing |
Held Catherine M\. Bartlett Supreme Trial, PRETRIAL CNF, FOR P ATTY (Conversion) Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
December 13, 2018 | hearing |
Held Catherine M\. Bartlett Supreme Trial, PRELIM CNF, 9AM (Conversion) Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
November 13, 2018 | hearing |
Adjourned Catherine M\. Bartlett PRELIM CNF, 9AM (Conversion) Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
September 11, 2018 | hearing |
Held Catherine M\. Bartlett Supreme Initial (first time on), OSC-9:00AM (Conversion) Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
September 11, 2018 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Catherine M\. Bartlett (Mtn) W/APPS (Conversion) Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
August 13, 2018 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Catherine M\. Bartlett (Mtn) W/APPS (Conversion) Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
August 13, 2018 | Motion |
Attorney - Disqualify/Relieve/Substitute/Withdraw (Motion #001) Decided: 09/11/2018Granted Before Justice: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bartlett, Hon. Catherine M. |