Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bethana M Peterson v. Jesse B Peterson
A Matrimonial - Contested case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. Judge Danielle Fogel presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 19, 2021
Last Refreshed
February 09, 2023
Filing Location
Onondaga County, NY
Judge
Hon. Danielle Fogel
Category
Matrimonial - Contested
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 | CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET | ||
June 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
June 09, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 08, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
June 08, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
June 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY | ||
June 07, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
June 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
June 07, 2022 | STIPULATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
June 07, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
June 02, 2022 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT - MODIFIED | ||
April 14, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
April 14, 2022 | TRIAL - EXHIBIT LIST | ||
April 14, 2022 | TRIAL - WITNESS LIST | ||
April 13, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
March 21, 2022 | DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION | ||
March 21, 2022 | PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION | ||
March 18, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 09, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
February 22, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
February 22, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
February 22, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
February 11, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 05, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 10, 2021 | APPENDIX | ||
November 10, 2021 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
November 10, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
November 10, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) - B | ||
November 10, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
November 10, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT | ||
November 10, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 04, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
July 19, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL | ||
June 04, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 04, 2021 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
June 04, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 04, 2021 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
June 04, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
April 19, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |