Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank v. Michele Mcdowell
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 12, 2023
Filing Location
Oneida County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Jan 27, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 27, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Jan 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jan 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jan 27, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Jan 27, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 29, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 29, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 27, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Auth |
||
January 27, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) judgment |
||
January 27, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Invoice |
||
January 27, 2022 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
January 27, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
January 27, 2022 | Affidavit of Military Investigation | ||
January 27, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION 3215G |
||
February 16, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
February 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/MICHELE MCDOWELL |
||
January 29, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 29, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |