Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Doreen Maertin aka Doreen M. Maertin
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Niagara County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 10, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Niagara County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 06, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: Oct 06, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Oct 06, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Oct 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 06, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Oct 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 05, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Oct 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 25, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Aug 10, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2021 | Affidavit of Compliance | ||
October 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation of Facts |
||
October 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 06, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Non Military Affidavit |
||
October 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
October 05, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Non Military Affidavit |
||
October 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
October 05, 2021 | Affidavit of Compliance | ||
August 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 10, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
August 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A retail installment contract |