Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Rxmedical Dynamics Llc, Charlotte Wray, Frank Cerasoli v. Lani Adler Esq.
On July 19, 2019 a commercial division case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge SHERWOOD, O presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 19, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. SHERWOOD, O
Category
Commercial Division
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Consolidation
Case Duration
3 months and 26 days
Overview
Plaintiffs are seeking a trial de novo in connection with an arbitration award, dated
on or about June 20, 2019, obtained in their absence. A copy of that award is attached to this
Complaint as Ex. A. In an email dated on or about June 20, 2019, the same day as the award, Ms.
Elizabeth Biberman, the Program Administrator for the Joint Committee on Fee Disputes and
Conciliation, acknowledged that “the client” i.e., Plaintiffs, were “disadvantaged” by the
arbitration, in that the Plaintiffs “could not attend and I was unable to confirm that the date was going
forward before I left town.” A copy of that email is attached to this Complaint as Ex. B.
In connection with the arbitration, Defendant demanded that Plaintiffs pay some
$48,841.79 in purported overdue fees, but those fees, if due at all (and Plaintiffs dispute that any
fees are due whatsoever), are due to Ms. Adler’s former firm, Fensterstock & Partners LLP
(“Fensterstock”), and not to Ms. Adler. A copy of the Fensterstock engagement letter agreement
is attached to this Complaint as Ex. C. Regardless, as previously stated, Plaintiffs owe no fees to
Causes of Action
COUNT I Declaratory Judgment – No Fees Due to Adler
COUNT II Declaratory Judgment – Unreasonable, Unnecessary, Excessive, and Unauthorized Legal Fees
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Nov 26, 2019ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: Oct 22, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Oct 17, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Sep 18, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jul 19, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance among All Parties |
|
November 13, 2019 | hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) STATUS CONFERENCE 49 9:30AM NYSCEF 11 Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
October 22, 2019 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 9:30 AM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - CONSOLIDATION | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to December 4, |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER Assignment to Commercial Division, as related to action before Justice Sherwood |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to October 17, 2019 |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D NYCLA Arbitrator and Administrator Confusion as to June 5, 2019 Hearing Date Proceeding |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Fensterstock Engagement Letter Agreement |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B NYCLA email acknowledging Plaintiffs are at a disadvantage |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Arbitral Award |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |