Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jones Law Firm, P.C. (Counterclaim Defendant) v. J Synergy Green, Inc. (Counterclaim Plaintiff), Avrohom Y Sorotzkin (Counterclaim Plaintiff), Yaakov Milstein (Counterclaim Plaintiff)
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Lyle E. Frank presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 02, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 25, 2024
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Judgment on Award
Overview
Causes of Action
Count 1: Breach of Engagement Agreement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: Jan 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 002)
Date: Jan 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 002)
Date: Jan 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024AFFIRMATION (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 002)
Date: Jan 08, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jan 08, 2024STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 002)
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: Dec 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 22, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: Nov 21, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: Nov 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Nov 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 06, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Nov 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Nov 06, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Oct 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - I
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - J
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - H
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: Sep 22, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - J
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - H
Date: Sep 14, 2023SUMMONS (COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM - CPLR 3019)
Date: Sep 14, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - K
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - I
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Sep 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Sep 14, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Aug 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Aug 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Aug 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Aug 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Aug 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Aug 02, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 02, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
January 23, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
January 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Proposed Amended Third-Party Complaint |
||
January 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) 08.02.23 decision |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Repeated Requests for Documents in JAMS Arbitration |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Sorotzkin Response to Imminent Withdrawal |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Transcript of the JAMS proceeding, October 26, 2022 |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Bring this Matter to a Resolution |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #001) Final Principal Amount Owed |
||
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of T. Bryce Jones in Further Support |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Order No. 7 from JAMS Arbitration, dated October 28, 2022 |
||
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of David Treyster |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #001) Last Chance to Pay Legal Fees |
||
January 11, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter requesting oral argument |
||
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Affirmation of Elaine Platt in Reply |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #001) Initiation of PAMS Arbitration |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) Terminating Attorney Client Relationship |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Additional Discount |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Immediate Past Due Payment or Withdrawal Imminent |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Email Asking About Contingency & Denial of Such |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) February 17, 2023, Email from Jared Harary of V-Discovery |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Final Proposed Discount |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Discounted Rates were Contingent |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Application of Deposit & Discounted Rates |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Amended Engagement Agreement |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) One of Two Options Offered |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Original Engagement Agreement |
||
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) affirmation of Jeffrey Goldstein of PAM in support of motion to dismiss |
||
January 08, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 08, 2024 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Adjourn Return Date & Reply Date on Motion #001 |
||
January 08, 2024 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stipulation to dismiss second, third, fourth, and sixth counterclaim against third party defendant P stipulation to dismiss second, third, fourth, and sixth counterclaim against third party defendant P ... show more |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) attorney affirmation in support of motion to dismiss |
||
December 22, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) 08.02.23 Decision and Order |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) 10.26.22 transcript of JAMS conference |
||
November 22, 2023 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER stipulation to adjourn time for defendant PAM to answer or otherwise respond to third party complain stipulation to adjourn time for defendant PAM to answer or otherwise respond to third party complain ... show more |
||
November 21, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
November 17, 2023 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
November 16, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Third Party Complaint - David Treyster |
||
November 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Third Party Complaint - Professional Arbitration and Mediation LLC |
||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Excerpts from Transcript of JAMS Hearing, October 26, 2022 |
||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) The Complaint in Siegel v. Milstein, the Nassau County Case |
||
November 06, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation of Elaine Platt |
||
November 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 02, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Petition to Confirm and opposition |
||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J Decision 08.02.23 |
||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Wyoming Dept. of State PAMS information |
||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G NYS Dept. of State PAMS information |
||
September 22, 2023 | THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT | ||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Jones Law Firm v. Peck complaint |
||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Jones law Firm v. Marino complaint |
||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Jones Firm solicitation letter |
||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Jones Firm Engagement Agreement |
||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Alma Bank v. Hudson Law Group pleadings |
||
September 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Jones Law Firm v. Riddle petition to confirm award |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J Decision 08.02.23 |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Jones Firm Engagement Agreement |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Jones Firm Solicitation Letter |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Wyoming Dept. of State PAMS information |
||
September 14, 2023 |
SUMMONS (COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM - CPLR 3019) Third-Party Summons |
||
September 14, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G NYS Dept. of State PAMS information |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K Jones v. Keep Healthy petition |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Alma Bank v. Hudson Law Group pleadings |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Petition to confirm arbitration award and opposition |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Jones Law Firm v. Riddle petition |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Jones Law Firm v. Marino complaint |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Jones Law Firm v. Peck complaint |
||
August 08, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
August 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Payment Plan Addendum |
||
August 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Interest Calculations |
||
August 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Legal Fees Owed |
||
August 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Collections Legal Fees |
||
August 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Engagement Agreement |
||
August 02, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |