Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Latonia Greene v. 207-213 West 144th Street Housing Development Fund Corp., Laurine Jackson, Benjamin Baker, Dwight Jordan, Malika Cherry, Leah Francis, Beverly Yvette Savage, New Bedford Management Corp., John Doe Nos. 1-20
A Commercial - Business Entity case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge James Edward D'Auguste presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 17, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 28, 2024
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Judge
Hon. James Edward D'Auguste
Category
Commercial - Business Entity
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Status
Settlement
Overview
I. This action arises from a years-long plan, scheme and design by each of the named
Defendants designed to rob Plaintiff of her rights as a shareholder and frustrate her numerous
attempts to be treated as an equal rights shareholder.
Specifically, beginning as early as 2003, Plaintiff, a shareholder and resident of the
building owned by the HDFC, has been treated in an inequitable and harassing manner by each of
Causes of Action
CAUSES OF ACTION
1. DECLARATORY JUDGMENT (Against Defendants)
2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY (Against the Board)
3. DISCRIMINATION UNDER THE NEW YORK STATE HUMAN RIGHTS LAW (15 N.Y. Exec. Law§ 290 et seq.] (Against Board and Management Co.)
4. DISCRIMINATION UNDER THE NEW YORK CITY HUMAN RIGHTS LAW [N.Y.C. Admin. Code§ 8-101 et seq.) (Against Board)
5. DEMAND FOR INSPECTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS PURSUANT TO BCL § 624 (Against Defendants)
Case Complaint Summary
This is a complaint filed in New York County, New York by plaintiff Latonia Greene ("Plaintiff' or "Greene") against numerous defendants, including 207-213 West 144th Street Housing Development Fund Corporation ("Defendant HDFC"), New Bedford Man…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Aug 30, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Aug 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Aug 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: Aug 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 28, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Aug 11, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Jun 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 3
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 2
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 4
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: May 17, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: May 17, 2023SUMMONS
Date: May 17, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss |
||
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service for Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Verified Complaint with Exhibits |
||
October 20, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Complaint |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause with Decision and Order in Related Action filed by Douglas Fayton |
||
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Verified Complaint |
||
September 08, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Adjourning Return Date on Motion to Dismiss [Mot. 001] |
||
August 30, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance by Stephen R. Stern on Behalf of Plaintiff |
||
August 28, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) 5/21/19 Co-op notice to Plaintiff that she is not a shareholder |
||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Correspondence re settling Supreme Court matter |
||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 4/11/2017 - Plaintiff's purported proof of shareholders status |
||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) 3/9/2017 Stipulation of Settlement |
||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Tenant Ledger |
||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Co-op Conversion Materials |
||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint |
||
August 28, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
August 28, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
August 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss |
||
August 11, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
June 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service for Notice of Electronic Filing, Summons and Verified Complaint with Exhibits Affirmation of Service for Notice of Electronic Filing, Summons and Verified Complaint with Exhibits ... show more |
||
June 27, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
June 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint with Exhibits and Notice of Electronic Filin Affidavit of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint with Exhibits and Notice of Electronic Filin ... show more |
||
June 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Notice of Electronic Filing, Summons and Verified Complaint with Exhibits o Affidavit of Service for Notice of Electronic Filing, Summons and Verified Complaint with Exhibits o ... show more |
||
May 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Notice of Electronic Filing, Summons and Verified Complaint with Exhibits o Affidavit of Service for Notice of Electronic Filing, Summons and Verified Complaint with Exhibits o ... show more |
||
May 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Exhibit 3 to Verified Complaint |
||
May 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 to Verified Complaint |
||
May 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Exhibit 4 to Verified Complaint |
||
May 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 to Verified Complaint |
||
May 17, 2023 |
COMPLAINT Verified Complaint |
||
May 17, 2023 | Summons |