Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Vijisan Ny, Llc v. Rafaello & Company Inc.
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by Vijisan Ny, Llc, represented by Balistreri, Charles M, against Rafaello & Company Inc., in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Louis L. Nock presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 17, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 01, 2024
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Judgment (Other)
Overview
Causes of Action
1. FOR GOODS SOLD AND DELIVERED
2. BASED ON ACCOUNT STATED
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Dec 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 06, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: Jul 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 3
Date: Jul 27, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: Jul 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jul 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Jul 27, 2023BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED)
Date: Jul 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 2
Date: Jul 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 13, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: May 17, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: May 17, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment - proposed |
||
December 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - Afd of Debt of Jignesh Shah |
||
December 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Litback, NOM.ejudgment |
||
December 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Sums and Complaint |
||
December 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Afm in Support of NOM.ejudgment |
||
December 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Afm of Mailing of Additional Notice to Suit |
||
December 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Exhibit F - Invoices |
||
December 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS on debtor, NOM.ejudgment |
||
December 06, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOM.ejudgment |
||
December 06, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhiibit E - Statement of Account dated 10-25-2022 |
||
December 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - AOS on defendant |
||
July 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Afm of Facts Constituting the Claim, Default and Amount Due |
||
July 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Litigation back, default judgment |
||
July 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Afm of Mailing of Add'l Notice to Suit |
||
July 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS on defendant |
||
July 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Afd of Debt |
||
July 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Statement of Account dated 10-25-2022 |
||
July 27, 2023 |
BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) Bill of Costs |
||
July 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Invoices |
||
June 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS on defendant |
||
May 17, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Sums and Verified Complaint |
||
May 17, 2023 |
CONSENT TO EFILING EFM1 Mandatory Efiling Notice |