Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Karen Murphy v. 815 Fifth Avenue Llc
On October 27, 2010 a commercial division case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Melvin Schweitzer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 27, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Judge
Category
Commercial Division
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
2 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE
Date: Jan 06, 2011DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 16, 2010AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 11, 2010ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 10, 2010ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 28, 2010AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 28, 2010AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 28, 2010AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 28, 2010RJI -RE: OSC/EXPARTE APP. (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 28, 2010SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 27, 2010Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 16, 2010 |
|
November 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 10, 2010 |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) | |
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) [Proposed] Order to Show Cause |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ASSIGNMENT TO THE COMMERCIAL DIVISION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Assignment to the Commercial Division and in Compliance with 22 NYCRR 202. |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Iris Shorin |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Robert M. Milner |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Karen Murphy |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OSC/EXPARTE APP. (Motion #001) Request for Judicial Intervention |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit 7 to Affidavits and Affirmation in Support |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit 6 to Affidavits and Affirmation in Support |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit 5 to Affidavits and Affirmation in Support |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit 4 to Affidavits and Affirmation in Support |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit 3 to Affidavits and Affirmation in Support |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit 2 to Affidavits and Affirmation in Support |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit 1 to Affidavits and Affirmation in Support |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint |