Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., As Successor By Merger To Wachovia Bank, National Association v. David Lichtenstein
On October 27, 2010 a commercial division case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Bernard Fried presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 27, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial Division
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
5 months and 30 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 27, 2011DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Apr 26, 2011STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE
Date: Apr 18, 2011LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 24, 2011LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Mar 23, 2011LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 11, 2011LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Mar 08, 2011STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion 006)
Date: Feb 15, 2011STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Feb 10, 2011MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 17, 2010MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 10, 2010AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 10, 2010STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 22, 2010MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 27, 2010RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Oct 27, 2010AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 27, 2010STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ASSIGNMENT TO THE COMMERCIAL DIVISION
Date: Oct 27, 2010NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 27, 2010Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 27 |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 26, 2011 | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice | |
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, SO ORDERED LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on Ma |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Justice Fried on behalf of both parties requesting an adjournment of the 3/24/11 hearing. |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, SO ORDERED LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on Ma |
|
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Justice Fried regarding the parties' joint request for an adjournment of the March 11, 201 |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #006) re: motion no. 006, SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 15, |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stipulation Adjourning Hearing |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Cross Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Mo |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
ADDITIONAL EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Compendium of Unreported Cases Cited by Plaintiff in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant' |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
ADDITIONAL EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Compendium Of Unpublished Cases Cited By Defendant David Lichtenstein In Support Of Defendant's Cros |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum Of Law Of Defendant David Lichtenstein In Support Of Defendant's Cross Motion To Dismiss |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit Of David Lichtenstein In Support Of Defendant's Cross Motion To Dismiss And In Opposition |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001) Defendant's Notice of Cross Motion to Dismiss And Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgm |
|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Ronal Bhagat in Support of Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Summary Judgme |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ASSIGNMENT TO THE COMMERCIAL DIVISION | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit T |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit S |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit R |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit Q |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit P |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit O |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit N |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit M |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit L |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
ADDITIONAL EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit K |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit J |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit I |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit H |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit G |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit F |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit E |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit D |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit C |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit B |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit A |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE Summons and Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint |