Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Broadcast Music, Inc. v. Slacker, Inc.
On March 10, 2020 a commercial - contract case was filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., represented by Lower, Jonathon Brugh, against Slacker, Inc., in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Nancy M. Bannon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 10, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 07, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 002)
Date: Mar 18, 2021DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Mar 18, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 18, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Mar 17, 2021ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED)
Date: Feb 16, 2021NOTIFICATION FOR SEALING (Motion 001)
Date: Feb 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion 002)
Date: Feb 12, 2021ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED)
Date: Dec 14, 2020DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Dec 14, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 14, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 14, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 03, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Dec 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 01, 2020JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 01, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 01, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 01, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Dec 01, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 01, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 01, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 17, 2020SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 10, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Notice of Entry |
||
March 18, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 18, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry |
||
March 17, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Voluntary Discontinuance Without Prejudice |
||
March 17, 2021 |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001) Notice of Withdrawal of Order to Show Cause With Temporary Restraining Order |
||
February 16, 2021 | ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED) | ||
February 16, 2021 |
NOTIFICATION FOR SEALING (Motion #001) Notification for Sealing in an Electronically Filed Case |
||
February 12, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002) Letter to the Honorable Nancy M. Bannon, J.S.C. from J. Brugh Lower, Esq. |
||
December 14, 2020 | ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED) | ||
December 14, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 14, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Notice of Entry |
||
December 14, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FOR SEALING (Motion #001) Notification for Sealing in Electronically Filed Case, with Attached Interim Decision and Order on M Notification for Sealing in Electronically Filed Case, with Attached Interim Decision and Order on M ... show more |
||
December 14, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry |
||
December 11, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002) Letter to the Honorable Nancy M. Bannon J.S.C. from J. Brugh Lower, Esq. |
||
December 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service |
||
December 02, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FOR SEALING Notification for Sealing in Electronically Filed Case, with Attached Order to Show Cause and Tempora Notification for Sealing in Electronically Filed Case, with Attached Order to Show Cause and Tempora ... show more |
||
December 02, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 01, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affirmation of Service |
||
December 01, 2020 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #002) [Proposed] Final Judgment by Default |
||
December 01, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation of J. Brugh Lower is Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment |
||
December 01, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service |
||
December 01, 2020 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion for Default Judgment |
||
December 01, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Affirmation of J. Brugh Lower in Support of Application for Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restr Affirmation of J. Brugh Lower in Support of Application for Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restr ... show more |
||
December 01, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affidavit of Evan Parness is Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment [REDACTED] |
||
December 01, 2020 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 01, 2020 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) [Proposed] Order to Show Cause With Temporary Restraining Order |
||
December 01, 2020 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) [Proposed] Order Sealing Document |
||
December 01, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION - REQUEST TO SEAL Sealed |
||
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint |