Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
45th Street Blt Restaurant, Llc v. Waterscape Resort Ii, Llc
On March 20, 2014 a commercial (general) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Barbara Jaffe presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 20, 2014
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial (General)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 1 month and 24 days
Overview
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 31, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 27, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2016PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: Feb 23, 2016STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Sep 09, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 004)
Date: Sep 08, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 004)
Date: Sep 08, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 004)
Date: Aug 21, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion 004)
Date: Aug 07, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jul 08, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jul 07, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 004)
Date: Jul 01, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jul 01, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jul 01, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jul 01, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jul 01, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Apr 09, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Mar 24, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jan 22, 2015DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 12, 2014DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Dec 12, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 003)
Date: Nov 14, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 003)
Date: Nov 14, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Nov 14, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 003)
Date: Sep 11, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Sep 11, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 11, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 07, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 07, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 07, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 07, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Aug 05, 2014REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: Jul 10, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 02, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 02, 2014ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: Jun 27, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 11, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 11, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 11, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 11, 2014DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: May 05, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 17, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 17, 2014ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: Apr 15, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 03, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 03, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Apr 02, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 02, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 24, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: Mar 20, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 20, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: Mar 20, 2014RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Mar 20, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2016 | hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 12 2:15PM SEE NYSCEF DOC#221 Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Entry |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #004) | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #004) | |
October 21, 2015 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 12EFM 11:00AM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | |
September 09, 2015 | hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (80 CENTRE ST) (Motion #004) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 11:00AM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004) | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004) Laskowitz Affirmation |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Restaurant Dinner Menu |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Restaurant Lunch Menu |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Proposed Room Service Menu |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Commercial Excess Liability Policy |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Insurance Policy |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #004) Restaurant Services America Operating Agreement |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #004) Cassa NY Restaurant Operating Agreement |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Sublease |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Workers' Compensation Policy |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #004) | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #004) agreement excerpts |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Guaranty |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Prior Aff |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004) | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #004) ACRIS info |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #004) Condo Dec |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #004) Letter |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #004) Agreement |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #004) Letter |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #004) Post Closing Letter |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #004) Decision |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #004) Discovery Responses |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #004) Chakalo Aff |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Tax Bill |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Offering Plan Excerpts |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004) Smillie Aff |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Emails |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Letter |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) SLA Records |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004) Affidavit of Villanueva |
|
August 19, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE STATUS CONFERENCE 12 2:15PM MOT. PENDNG. Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
August 10, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #004) | |
August 05, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 12 2:15PM N/I 10/30/15 Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
July 23, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #004) From 7/23 to 8/10 |
|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004) Laskowitz Affirmation |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004) Levy Affidavit |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004) Chakalo Affidavit |
|
July 01, 2015 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #004) Decided: 01/29/2016SEE DECISION Before Justice: JAFFE, BARBARA Answer demanded: No Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion #004) Charles Fan Affidavit |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion #004) Plaintiffs Sales tax Returns |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #004) Check Copies for rent paid |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #004) Revised Estoppel |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #004) Initial Estoppel |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #004) Fully Executed SDNA |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #004) Initial SDNA |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #004) Correspondence with Plaintiff and Defendants Bank |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #004) Disabiliy Insurance Certificate |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #004) Worker's Compensation Insurance Certificate |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #004) General Insurance Certificate of Liability |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #004) Decision on Yellowstone 2-3 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #004) Notice to Cure 5 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #004) Notice to Cure 4 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #004) Notice to Cure 3 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #004) Notice to Cure 2 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #004) Decision on Yellowstone 1 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Notice to Cure 1 |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Lease |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #004) |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #004) Emails |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #004) Emails |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #004) Emails |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #004) Emails |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #004) Emails |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #004) Emails |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #004) |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Emails |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Menu |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion #004) Reply to Counterclaims |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion #004) Answer with Counterclaims |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion #004) Summons and Complaint |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion #004) Email Correspondence between Counsels |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion #004) Real Estate tax Invoice |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #008, COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 18 |
|
May 13, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 12 2:15PM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Re: Appearance #007, SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 9, 20 |
|
April 08, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 12 2:15PM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
March 25, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 12 2:15PM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Defendant's letter to Judge |
|
March 18, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 12 2:15PM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Re: Appearance #004, SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 22, |
|
January 14, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 12 2:15PM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Orders |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on December |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) re: motion no. 003, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on December |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) Supplemental Affirmation |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Supplemental Affirmation |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #003) Email correspondence November 3, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #003) Email correspondence October 31, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #003) Email correspondence October 21, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #003) Email correspondence October 14, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #003) email chain-page 4 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003) Email correspondence October 10, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) email correspondence October 6, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Email correspondence re. arrears |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Email correspondence September 1, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003) Menus |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) Decision dated May 2, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Notice to Cure- July 25, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Notice to Cure- April 30, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Exhibit E |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Exhibit D |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exhibit C |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A |
|
November 12, 2014 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 12 10:00AM N/I 11/12/14 Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
November 12, 2014 | hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 11EFM 10:30AM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
November 05, 2014 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 12 10:00AM N/I 11/12/14 Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
November 05, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 12EFM 10:30AM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
October 15, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 12EFM 10:00AM CONTROL Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
September 15, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 12EFM 9:30AM CONTROL Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #003) Memorandum of Law in opposition to Plaintiff's Yellowstone Injunction Motion |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) Affidavit of Charles Fan in opposition |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) menu |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Photographs |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Notice to Cure |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) menus |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003) re: motion no. 003, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 11, 2014 |
|
August 08, 2014 | Motion |
PREL INJUNCTION/TEMP REST ORDR (Motion #003) Decided: 12/12/2014SEE DECISION Before Justice: JAFFE, BARBARA Answer demanded: No Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003) Chakalo Affidavit |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003) | |
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) | |
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) | |
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Menu |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Photograph |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) Email of Intention to File |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Notice to Cure |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Lease |
|
August 06, 2014 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 12 10:00AM W/SEQ.002 Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
August 06, 2014 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 12EFM 12EFM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #001, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Augus |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Supplemental Affidavit in Opposition |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Photographs |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Notice to Cure |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) menus |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) menu |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Verified Reply to Amended Counterclaims |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 09, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 12EFM 10:00AM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) Memorandum of Law in opposition to Plaintiff's Yellowstone Injunction Motion |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affidavit of Charles Fan in opposition |
|
July 02, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 12EFM 10:00AM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) affidavit of service |
|
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Verified Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002) | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 11, 2014 |
|
June 11, 2014 | Motion |
PREL INJUNCTION/TEMP REST ORDR (Motion #002) Decided: 12/12/2014SEE DECISION Before Justice: JAFFE, BARBARA Answer demanded: No Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Menu |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #002) Proposed Amended Verified Complaint |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #002) Email regarding the instant application |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #002) Correspondence extending cure period |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Email regarding cure period |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) Notice to Cure |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Lease |
|
May 07, 2014 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 12EFM 12EFM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 05, |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | |
April 23, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 12EFM CONTROL Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Supplemental Affidavit in Opposition |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Amended Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Yellowstone Injunction Motion |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #001) Exhibit N |
|
April 16, 2014 | Motion |
PREL INJUNCTION/TEMP REST ORDR (Motion #001) Decided: 05/07/2014SEE DECISION Before Justice: JAFFE, BARBARA Answer demanded: No Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
April 16, 2014 | hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (80 CENTRE ST) (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 12EFM 12:00PM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Counterclaims |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Charles Fan |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in opposition to Plaintiff's Yellowstone Injunction Motion |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) Exhibit M |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Exhibit L |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Exhibit K |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Exhibit J |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Exhibit I |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Exhibit H |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Exhibit G |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Exhibit F |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhibit E |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Nenad Nelson Selimov |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Barbara Jaffe |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) | |
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Waterscape Resort II |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 24, 2014 |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Chakalo Affidavit |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 Notice of TRO |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 Estoppel with Signature |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 Original Estoppel |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 Subordination and Nondisturbance Agreement |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 Plaintiffs insurance documents -workers comp |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 Plaintiffs insurance documents after second request for changes |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Plaintiffs insurance documents after first request for changes |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Plaintiffs initial insurance documents |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Notice to Cure 3 |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Notice to Cure 2 |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Letters confirming extension of time |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Notice to Cure 1 |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Lease |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |