Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
925d Realty Llc v. Viles Contracting Corp., Fernando Vidal
On January 29, 2014 a commercial division case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Shirley Werner Kornreich presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 29, 2014
Last Refreshed
December 27, 2022
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial Division
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Oct 14, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: Jun 18, 2015JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: Feb 11, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING (Motion 002)
Date: Feb 06, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jan 28, 2015EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 11, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Feb 27, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 14, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 14, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 14, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Jan 29, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Jan 29, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Jan 29, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Jan 29, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Jan 29, 2014EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Jan 29, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 29, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 26, 2015 | Motion |
REFERENCE - HEAR & REPORT (Motion #002) Decided: 02/26/2015CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: GAMMERMAN, IRA (JHO) Answer demanded: No Judge: GAMMERMAN, IRA (JHO) |
|
February 26, 2015 | hearing |
DIRECTED FOR HEARING (Motion #002) SPECIAL REFEREE PART Judge: SPECIAL REFEREE |
|
February 26, 2015 | hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 27 Judge: GAMMERMAN, IRA (JHO) |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment to Clerk with Decision and Bill of Costs |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING (Motion #002) to a JHO or Special Referee to hear and report on attys fees. |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry - Decision on SJM | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on January re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on January ... show more |
|
January 06, 2015 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) EFILED COMMERCIAL SUBM CAL NO OPP Judge: KORNREICH, SHIRLEY WERNER |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) August 2012 Note |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) August 2012 Guaranty |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) April 2013 Note |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) April 2013 Guaranty |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Verified Answer |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Demand letter re 2013 |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint and AOS |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Demand Letter re 2012 |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) RJI with Addendum |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) HG Afdv. in Support of Motion |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Simon Afdv. of Merit in Support of Motion |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
December 11, 2014 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 01/12/2015SEE DECISION Before Justice: KORNREICH, SHIRLEY WERNER Answer demanded: No Judge: KORNREICH, SHIRLEY WERNER |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Vidal |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Viles Contracting on Vidal |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Viles Contracting on Sect. of State |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A August 2012 Demand Promissory Note |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Demand Letter re 2013 |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D April 2013 Demand Promissory Note |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Demand letter re 2012 |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B August 2012 Guaranty |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E April 2013 Guaranty |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons, Complaint, and Verification of Complaint |