Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Greenhills Ventures, Llc v. Medicametrix, Inc.
On January 16, 2019 a commercial - contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Debra A. James presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2019
Last Refreshed
December 25, 2022
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 8 months and 7 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sealed |
||
October 16, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Sealed |
||
September 24, 2020 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) Sealed |
||
April 28, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 59 2:30 PM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE Sealed |
|
January 15, 2020 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR SEALED Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
December 09, 2019 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #002) Decided: 09/23/2020CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: JAMES, DEBRA A. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Sealed |
|
December 03, 2019 | hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 59 2:30 PM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
October 22, 2019 | hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 59 2:30 PM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
August 13, 2019 | hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 59 2:30 PM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sealed |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Sealed |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTIFICATION FOR SEALING Sealed |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
March 08, 2019 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 59 ORDER RECEIVED Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
February 21, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 59 9:00AM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HARD COPY EXHIBIT FILING (Motion #001) NOTICE OF HARD COPY EXHIBIT FILING (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Sealed |
|
January 17, 2019 | Motion |
SEAL ORDER (Motion #001) Decided: 03/29/2019SEE DECISION Before Justice: JAMES, DEBRA A. Answer demanded: No Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Sealed |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons WITH NOTICE Sealed |