Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cava Construction & Development Inc. v. Tower Insurance Company Of New York, I.K.E. Electrical Corp. A/K/A Ike Electrical Corp.
On January 10, 2014 a commercial division case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Andrew S Borrok presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 10, 2014
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Ramos, Charles; Singh, Anil; Feinberg, Jeremy; Schweitzer, Melvin; Reed, Robert; Scarpulla, Saliann;Category
Commercial Division
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 6 months and 30 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 14, 2019DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 006)
Date: May 16, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 006)
Date: Apr 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 006)
Date: Apr 03, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 006)
Date: Apr 03, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: Aug 04, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: Jul 21, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: Apr 10, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jan 06, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Nov 22, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Oct 20, 2016STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 19, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Oct 19, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Sep 14, 2016SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: Aug 29, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: Aug 10, 2016DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 11, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: Jun 28, 2016PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: Jun 28, 2016DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Jun 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 003)
Date: Feb 05, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 003)
Date: Feb 05, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 004)
Date: Feb 05, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 19, 2016STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 19, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 19, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 003)
Date: Jan 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Jan 19, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Dec 08, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Dec 08, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Dec 03, 2015STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 004)
Date: Dec 03, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion 004)
Date: Dec 03, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Dec 03, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Dec 02, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 003) Corrected
Date: Dec 02, 2015ORDER - AMENDED (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 16, 2015NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 13, 2015PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 13, 2015DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 09, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 02, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Sep 24, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Sep 21, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Sep 21, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 002)
Date: Sep 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Sep 16, 2015ANSWER
Date: Jun 05, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Jun 04, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 08, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Apr 30, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 29, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: Apr 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 22, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 22, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 21, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2015ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 26, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Mar 26, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Mar 26, 2015DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 17, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 001)
Date: Feb 25, 2015COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Feb 06, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Jan 23, 2015ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 23, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 22, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 22, 2014ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: Jul 16, 2014ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: Jul 15, 2014REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 06, 2014ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: May 06, 2014REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: Apr 17, 2014ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: Apr 07, 2014INTERROGATORIES
Date: Apr 02, 2014NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: Apr 02, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Mar 21, 2014ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: Mar 20, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 15, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 14, 2019 | hearing |
REMOVE STAY OFFICE/FOR REASSIGNING CASE PER NYSCEF DOC#267 Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
|
June 14, 2019 | hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE IAS PART 53 NYSCEF #267 Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006) | |
April 19, 2019 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #006) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006) Ike Electrical Notice of Motion to Vacate Stay and Enforce Settlement Agreement |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #006) Affirmation of Patrick Murray in Support of Motion to Vacate Stay and Enforce Settlement Agreement |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #006) Brief in Support of Motion to Vacate Stay and Enforce the Settlement Agreement |
|
April 03, 2019 | Motion |
VACATE (Motion #006) Decided: 05/16/2019SEE DECISION Before Justice: BORROK, ANDREW Answer demanded: Yes Judge: BORROK, ANDREW |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #006) Affirmation of Service |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #006) 010819 Email from Patrick Murray to John Ruggiero |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #006) 121318 Email from Patrick Murray to John Ruggiero |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #006) 110818 Email from Patrick Murray to John Ruggiero |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #006) 062218 Email from Patrick Murray to John Ruggiero |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #006) 041218 Email from Patrick Murray to John Ruggiero |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #006) 042517 Email from Patrick Murray to John Ruggiero |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #006) 042517 Email from John Ruggiero to Patrick Murray |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #006) United States Bankruptcy Court Notice of Order Dismissing Case |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #006) Order Removing Case |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #006) Order Staying Case |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #006) 041017 Letter from Patrick Murray to Justice Singh |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #006) Ike Electrical Corp. Voluntary Petition for Non-individuals Filing for Bankruptcy |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Stipulation Discontinuing Third Party Action with Prejudice |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Stipulation of Settlement of Third Party Action |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
July 20, 2017 | hearing |
STAYED IAS PART 53 Judge: RAMOS, CHARLES E. |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
April 06, 2017 | hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE STATUS CONFERENCE 45 2:30PM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
March 02, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 45 2:30PM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
February 02, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 45 2:30PM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Discontinuing Third-Party Action With Prejudice |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER WITHDRAWING APPEAL |
|
November 22, 2016 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 45 2:30PM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation of Settlement of Third-Party Action |
|
October 20, 2016 | hearing |
REFERENCE - SETTLED## (Motion #005) SPECIAL REFEREE PART TO PART 84R Judge: FEINBERG, JEREMY R./SP. REF. |
|
October 20, 2016 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 45 2:30PM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
REFEREE/JHO REPORT (Motion #005) STIPULATION TO JUDGE TO SO ORDER |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Enclosing Stipulation |
|
September 15, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #005) SPECIAL REFEREE PART 5/26/16 ORD DTE ATTY,CONSULTING FEES Judge: SPECIAL REFEREE |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
June 30, 2016 | Motion |
REFERENCE - HEAR & REPORT (Motion #005) Decided: 10/20/2016DISPOSITION OF REFERENCE Before Justice: FEINBERG, JEREMY R./SP. REF. Answer demanded: No Judge: FEINBERG, JEREMY R./SP. REF. |
|
June 30, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #005) SPECIAL REFEREE PART 5/26/16 ORD DTE ATTY,CONSULTING FEES Judge: SPECIAL REFEREE |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order |
|
June 23, 2016 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 45 2:30PM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING (Motion #005) to a JHO or Special Referee to hear and report. |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (to Affirmation of Bankruptcy) Bankruptcy Petition |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (of Bankruptcy) |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
April 21, 2016 | hearing |
DECISION RESERVED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 45EFM 10AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
April 21, 2016 | hearing |
DECISION RESERVED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 45EFM 10AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
April 21, 2016 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 45 10AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 25, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) ADJOURNED FOR WORKING COPIES 10AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
February 25, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) ADJOURNED FOR WORKING COPIES 10AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
February 25, 2016 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 45 10AM W MOTIONS 3&4 Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
February 11, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
February 11, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003) Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004) | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Exhibit F to the Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Exhibit E to the Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Exhibit D to the Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exhibit C to the Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B to the Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A to the Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Corrected Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affidavit of Ilan Adika in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affidavit of Dana Adika in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #004) I.K.E. Electrical Corp. and Third-Party Defendants' Response to Statement of Material Facts and Coun |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affidavit of Roneet Castelli in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affidavit of Rebecca Adika in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affidavit of Angelo Castelli in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #004) Brief of I.K.E. Electrical Corp. and Third-Party Defendants in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judg |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #003) | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) (of Marc R. Lepelstat, Esq.) |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Exhibit B to Affidavit of Yitzchak Adika in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Exhibit A to Affidavit of Yitchak Adika in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - FF (Motion #003) Consultant Invoices |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion #003) Legal Invoices |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion #003) Undertaking |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion #003) Amended Order |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion #003) Order |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion #003) General Release |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #003) Check |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #003) Order to Show Cause |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #003) Real Estate Listing |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #003) Property Deed |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #003) Title Report |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #003) Interrogatory Responses |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #003) Check |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #003) Check |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #003) Summons and Complaint |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #003) Certificate of Partial Satisfaction of Mechanics Lien |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #003) Check |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #003) Correspondence |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #003) Certificate of Partial Satisfaction of Mechanics Lien |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #003) Summons with Notice |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #003) Termination Notice |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) Notice Under Mechanics Lien Law |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Performance and Payment Bonds |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Standard Subcontract Agreement |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) General Agreement of Indemnity |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Verified Answer to the First Amended Third-Party Complaint and Affirmative Defenses |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) First Amended Verified Third-Party Complaint |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Verified Answer to Second Amended Cross-Claims |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Second Amended Verified Answer With Setoffs and Cross-Claims |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Reply to Counterclaims |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Amended Answer With Counterclaims |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Verified Complaint |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003) Affidavit of Francis J. DeMayo |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) Excerpt from Bruner and OConnor on Construction Law |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Amended Verified Answer to First Amended Third-Party Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Countercla |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Amended Verified Answer to Second Amended Cross-Claims and Cross-Claims of I.K.E. Electrical Corp. a |
|
January 14, 2016 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 45 2:30PM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
December 21, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
December 16, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Adourning Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Adjourning Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004) Affidavit of Francis J. DeMayo |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #004) | |
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #004) | |
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
December 03, 2015 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #004) Decided: 05/26/2016SEE DECISION Before Justice: SINGH, ANIL C. Answer demanded: No Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #004) Check |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #004) Order to Show Cause |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #004) Real Estate Listing |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #004) Property Deed |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #004) Title Report |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #004) Interrogatory Responses |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #004) Check |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #004) Check |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #004) Summons and Complaint |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #004) Certificate of Partial Satisfaction of Mechanics Lien |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #004) Check |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #004) Correspondence |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #004) Certificate of Partial Satisfaction of Mechanics Lien |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #004) Summons with Notice |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #004) Termination Notice |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #004) Notice Under Mechanics Lien Law |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #004) Performance and Payment Bonds |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #004) Standard Subcontract Agreement |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #004) General Agreement of Indemnity |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #004) Verified Answer to the First Amended Third-Party Complaint and Affirmative Defenses |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #004) First Amended Verified Third-Party Complaint |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Verified Answer to Second Amended Cross-Claims |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Second Amended Verified Answer With Setoffs and Cross-Claims |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Reply to Counterclaims |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Amended Answer With Counterclaims |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Verified Complaint |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) | |
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - FF (Motion #004) Consultant Invoices |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion #004) Legal Invoices |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion #004) Undertaking |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion #004) Amended Order |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion #004) Order |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion #004) General Release |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation of Patrick T. Murray |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) *Corrected* Notice of Motion for Leave to Amend |
|
December 02, 2015 | Motion |
AMEND SUPPLEMENT PLEADINGS (Motion #003) Decided: 05/26/2016MOTION DENIED Before Justice: SINGH, ANIL C. Answer demanded: No Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Verified Answer to First Amended Third Party Complaint |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Verified Answer to Second Amended Cross-Claims |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Amended Verified Answer to First Amended Third Party Complaint |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Amended Verified Answer to Second Amended Crossclaims |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Undertaking Upon Motion for Preliminary Injunction, pursuant to Amended Order (#106) |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) OF UNDERTAKING UPON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED | |
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #002) | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #002) | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT (Motion #002) | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Subject Order |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
October 09, 2015 | hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 45EFM 10AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
October 09, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 45 10AM W/MOTION 2 Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
September 22, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 45 2:30 P.M. Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (re All claims of Plaintiff be discontinued against only Defendant Tower) |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) email chain |
|
June 10, 2015 | hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (60 CENTRE) (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 45EFM 12:00PM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER to 2nd Amended Complaint |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Re: Appearance #004, SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 8, 2015 |
|
May 04, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 45EFM 10AM Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 30, 2015 |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 29, 2015 |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (AMENDED) SECOND AMENDED ANSWER WITH SETOFFS AND CROSS-CLAIMS |
|
April 28, 2015 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 45 2:30 P.M. UPDATE Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
April 23, 2015 | Motion |
PREL INJUNCTION/TEMP REST ORDR (Motion #002) Decided: 10/09/2015SEE DECISION Before Justice: SINGH, ANIL C. Answer demanded: No Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) of Dana Adika |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) of Roneet Castelli |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) of Rebecca Adika |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) of Ilan Adika |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) of Angelo Castelli |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) of Yitchak Adika |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) letter dated 01/10/2014, to John P. Ruggiero, Esq. from Marc R. Lepelstat, Esq. |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Compliance with Uniform Rule 202.7(F), Commercial Division Rule 20 and CPLR 2217 | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #002) | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Correspondence |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Certificate of Partial Satisfaction of Mechanics Lien |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Summons with Notice |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Termination Notice |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Notice Under Mechanic's Lien Law |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Performance Bond |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Standard Subcontract Agreement |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) General Agreement of Indemnity |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Francis DeMayo |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Responses to Interrogatories |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Verified Answer to First Amended Third-Party Complaint |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) First Amended Verified Third-Party Complaint |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Answer of IKE Electrical |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Amended Verified Answer with Counterclaims |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) First Amended Verified Answer |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Verified Complaint |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) Affirmantion of Marc R. Lepelstat |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #002) Property Information |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #002) Deed |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #002) Property Records |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #002) Check |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #002) Check |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #002) Summons |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) Certificate of Partial Satisfaction of Mechanic's Lien |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) Checks |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Extending Time to Answer |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER extending Time to Answer |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 17 |
|
March 17, 2015 | hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 39EFM 11:00AM Judge: SCHWEITZER, MELVIN L. |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 25, 20 |
|
February 11, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 45EFM 9;30AM Judge: SCHWEITZER, MELVIN L. |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (of First Amended Verified Third-Party Complaint, with Exhibit A) |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) (First Amended Verified Third-Party Complaint) |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (to First Amended Verified Third-Party Complaint) |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Extending Time to Answer |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Yitzchak Adika |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Rebecca Adika |
|
January 09, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 45 CONTOL DATE Judge: SCHWEITZER, MELVIN L. |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Angelo Castelli |
|
December 23, 2014 | Motion |
SUBST/RELIEVE/WITHDRAW/PROHAC (Motion #001) Decided: 03/17/2015SEE DECISION Before Justice: SCARPULLA, SALIANN Answer demanded: No Judge: SCARPULLA, SALIANN |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT (with Exhibit A) |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #002, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Octob |
|
October 06, 2014 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 45 10:30AM PC@ 60 CENTRE Judge: SCHWEITZER, MELVIN L. |
|
July 17, 2014 | hearing |
TRANSFERRED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 43 9;30 A,M, COMMERCIAL DIVISION Judge: REED, ROBERT R. |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER entered in the Office of the County Clerk on July 16, 2014 |
|
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER entered in the Office of the County Clerk on July 15, 2014 |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) addendum in support of asignmen tto commercial division |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF ASSIGNMENT TO COMMERCIAL DIVISION |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) ANSWER OF IKE ELECTRICAL CORP. TO AMENDED CROSS-CLAIMS BY TOWER INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (AMENDED) AMENDED ANSWER WITH COUNTERCLAIMS |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (AMENDED) First Amended Verified Answer with Setoffs and Cross-Claims |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Setoffs and Cross-Claims |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | |
February 15, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
February 15, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (with Affirmation of Service) |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |