Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wilmer Cabrera as Administrator of the Estate of HENRY ESTEBAN SALINAS CERRATO v. United Parcel Service, Inc., Robert A. Kreitzer Jr., Creative Christmas, Inc., Lincoln Square Condominium, Altitude Equipment Rentals Llc
On April 01, 2015 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Paul A. Goetz presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 01, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Status
Appealed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
1. AGAINST DEFENDANT/SECOND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT CREATIVE CHRISTMAS, DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT/SECOND THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF ALTITUDE EQUIPMENT RENTALS, LLC ALLEGES:
2. AGAINST DEFENDANT/SECOND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT CREATIVE CHRISTMAS, DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT/SECOND THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF ALTITUDE EQUIPMENT RENTALS, LLC ALLEGES:
3. AGAINST DEFENDANT/SECOND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT CREATIVE CHRISTMAS, DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT/SECOND THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF ALTITUDE EQUIPMENT RENTALS, LLC ALLEGES:
4. AGAINST DEFENDANT/SECOND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT CREATIVE CHRISTMAS, DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT/SECOND THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF ALTITUDE EQUIPMENT RENTALS, LLC ALLEGES:
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Oct 07, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Dec 08, 2021REMITTITUR
Date: Dec 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: Aug 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 20, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion 002)
Date: Aug 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 002)
Date: Aug 18, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jul 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 24, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 22, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 22, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 22, 2020DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Jul 21, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: Jun 03, 2020URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: Mar 19, 2020NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: Aug 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 08, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: Aug 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 002)
Date: Aug 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 002)
Date: Aug 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 003)
Date: Aug 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: Jul 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001) Ex A - BP Altitude REDACTED Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 002) Ex A - BP Altitude REDACTED Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 003) Corrected
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 25, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jul 03, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jul 02, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: Jul 01, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: Jul 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: Jun 21, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - HH (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - GG (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 001) Alterra Policy Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 001) Property Loss Notice Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 001) Cabreras Amended Complaint Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion 001) Police Accident Report Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 002)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - FF (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 21, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: May 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 1K)
Date: Apr 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 1K)
Date: Apr 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Apr 08, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: Apr 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 1K)
Date: Apr 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Apr 08, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - GG (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - FF (Motion 003) Salinas Death Certificate Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G-1 (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B-1 (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B-2 (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1K)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - UU (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - PP (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 1K)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1K)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - OO (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - NN (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - LL (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - JJ (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1K)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 1K)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G-2 (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - II (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - SS (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - HH (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - TT (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - MM (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - KK (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - RR (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion 003)
Date: Apr 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 19, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: Feb 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Feb 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Feb 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Feb 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Feb 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Feb 11, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jan 03, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Jan 02, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: Dec 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Dec 20, 2018THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Dec 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Dec 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Dec 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Dec 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: Dec 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Dec 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - I
Date: Dec 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - H
Date: Dec 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - J
Date: Dec 20, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Dec 06, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: Nov 08, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 05, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 05, 2018ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Oct 04, 2018ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Jun 21, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Mar 29, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: Feb 02, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: Feb 02, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Oct 19, 2017ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Jul 20, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Apr 28, 2017ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Nov 10, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 20, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: Apr 25, 2016ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Dec 16, 2015COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES
Date: Dec 11, 2015ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: Dec 10, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Oct 22, 2015EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 2)
Date: Oct 13, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 2)
Date: Oct 13, 2015EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 2)
Date: Oct 13, 2015EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 2)
Date: Oct 13, 2015EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 2)
Date: Oct 13, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Aug 17, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Aug 17, 2015APPENDIX
Date: Aug 13, 2015ANSWER
Date: Aug 13, 2015SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: Aug 06, 2015COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Aug 06, 2015APPENDIX
Date: Jul 24, 2015THIRD PARTY NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Jul 24, 2015THIRD-PARTY ANSWER
Date: Jul 24, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 19, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1K)
Date: Jun 10, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: Jun 10, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jun 10, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Jun 10, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jun 10, 2015THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 10, 2015RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA)
Date: Jun 10, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1K)
Date: Jun 10, 2015RJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY)
Date: Jun 10, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 08, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 04, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 15, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 16, 2015SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 01, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request adjournment of trial date |
||
December 08, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 02, 2021 | REMITTITUR | ||
August 20, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
August 20, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 18, 2020 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #002) Informational Statement, Notice of Appeal |
||
August 18, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affirmation of Service |
||
July 24, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY w. Order granting our motion for summary judgment |
||
July 24, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit re NOE w. Order |
||
July 22, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Order dated July 20, 2020 |
||
July 22, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Order |
||
July 22, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Notice of Entry of Order dated July 20, 2020 |
||
July 22, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Order |
||
July 22, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) Notice of Entry of Order dated July 20, 2020 |
||
July 22, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Order |
||
July 21, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 20, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 9:30AM NYSCEF# 325,326,327 Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Order of Hon. Paul A. Goetz - Extending Pt 47's filing deadlines |
|
April 14, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
February 11, 2020 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
February 06, 2020 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 47 2:15PM Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
February 06, 2020 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 47 2:15PM Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
February 06, 2020 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 47 2:15PM Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
November 06, 2019 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
October 31, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 47 2:15PM ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
October 31, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 47 2:15PM ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
October 31, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 47 2:15PM ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Discontinuance as to Second Third-Party Action Only |
|
September 18, 2019 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
August 09, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 2:15 P.M. ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
August 09, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 2:15 P.M. ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
August 09, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 2:15 P.M. ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Affirmation in Reply and in Further Support of Altitude's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Robert Kreitzer (2014) Deposition Transcript |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) 4.4.2016 Cabrera's Supplemental Response to UPS's Combined Demands Redacted per 22 NYCRR 4.4.2016 Cabrera's Supplemental Response to UPS's Combined Demands Redacted |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Cristian Baquedano Deposition Transcript |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) 6.10.2015 UPS's Combined Demands to Cabrera Redacted per 22 NYCRR 6.10.2015 UPS's Combined Demands to Cabrera Redacted |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #001) CORRECTED Exhibit X Chen Affidavit, see NYSCEF Doc. # 180 |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) 12.8.2015 Cabrera's Response to Combined Demands |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Post-Accident Picture of Cones |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Surveillance Video Still |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affirmation of Service |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) 4.4.2016 Cabrera's Letter |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Post-Accident Picture of Boom Lift |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of service re Affirmation in Reply and in Further Support of Altitude's Motion for Summary Affidavit of service re Affirmation in Reply and in Further Support of Altitude's Motion for Summary ... show more |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants/ Third-Party Plaintiffs UPS and Kreitzers Motion for Summa Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants/ Third-Party Plaintiffs UPS and Kreitzers Motion for Summa ... show more |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of service re Altitude's Opposition to UPS and Kreitzers Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition to Altitude and Lincolns Motions for Summary Judgment |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Ex A - BP Altitude REDACTED Redacted per 22 NYCRR Ex A - BP Altitude REDACTED Redacted |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Ex C - Supp BP 4-4-16 |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Ex C - Supp BP 4-4-16 |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Ex F - Affidavit of Cristian Baquedano |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Ex B - BP Lincoln Square 12-8-15 REDACTED |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Ex F - Affidavit of Cristian Baquedano |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Ex E - Second Supp BP 4-8-19 |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Ex D - Second Supp BP 5-27-16 |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Ex A - BP Altitude REDACTED Redacted per 22 NYCRR Ex A - BP Altitude REDACTED Redacted |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Ex D - Second Supp BP 5-27-16 |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Ex A - BP Altitude REDACTED |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Ex E - Second Supp BP 4-8-19 |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Opposition |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Ex H - Expert Exchange - James Pugh |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Ex B - Photos of Accident Site and Truck |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Ex A - Affidavit of Cristian Baquedano |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Ex D - Excerpts of Kreitzer EBT |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Ex E - Excerpt of Baquedano EBT |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Ex C - Still Photo of Cristian Baquedano |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Ex F - Photos depicting damage to basket |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Ex I - Deft Expert Exchange - Stephen Chewning |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Ex G - Expert Exchange - James Roddy |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #003) Ex P - Affidavit - Onidia Saray Cabarera Arias |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #003) Ex N - Photos of Plaintiff-Decedent's Injuries |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #003) Ex S - Birth Certificate of Children in Honduras - REDACTED Redacted per 22 NYCRR Ex S - Birth Certificate of Children in Honduras - REDACTED Redacted |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #003) Ex Q - Redacted Birth Certificate - GSS |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Ex J - NYS Commercial Driver's Manual 2.7.4 |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #003) Ex T - Workers Compensation Board Decision |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) *Corrected* Ex K - Expert - Affidavit - James Roddy |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #003) Ex W - Affidavit - Maria Baquedano |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #003) Ex U - Paid Funeral Bill |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #003) Ex M - Medical Records REDACTED Redacted per 22 NYCRR Ex M - Medical Records REDACTED Redacted |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #003) Ex Y - Affidavit - Wilmer Cabrera |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #003) Ex L - EBT transcript Excerpts - Anthony Cordle |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #003) Ex V - EBT Transcript Excerpts - Wilmer Cabrera |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #003) Ex O - Expert - Affidavit - James Pugh |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #003) Ex Z - Order dated 7-20-17 |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #003) Ex X - Correspondence from Davivienda Bank |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #003) Ex R - Affidavit - Reina Isabel Baquedano |
|
July 08, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR PER SO ORDERED Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
July 08, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR PER SO ORDERED Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
July 08, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR PER SO ORDERED Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #002) Cabrera's BOP to Lincoln Square Redacted per 22 NYCRR Cabrera's BOP to Lincoln Square Redacted |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Picture of Boom Lift |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Wilmer Cabrera Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Altitude by Scott Robinson Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) The Light Agreement |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Portion of OSHA Investigation File |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Robert Kreitzer (2014) Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Lincoln Square by William Murphy Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #001) Robert Oliver Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Boom Lift Agreement |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - HH (Motion #001) ANSI SIA A92.5-2006 |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) Robert Kreitzer (2017) Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #001) Alterra's Complaint |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Robert Kreitzer (2014) Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - GG (Motion #001) Notice of Deposition (Altitude) |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion #001) Altitude's Response to UPS's Combined Demands |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Portion of OSHA Investigation File |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #002) Portion of NYPD Investigation File Redacted per 22 NYCRR Portion of NYPD Investigation File Redacted |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) Robert Oliver Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #001) Alterra Policy Redacted per 22 NYCRR Alterra Policy Redacted |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #001) MUTCD- Chapters 6C and 6E |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #001) Portion of NYPD Investigation File Redacted per 22 NYCRR Portion of NYPD Investigation File Redacted |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Creative Christmas by Robert Catalano Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #001) Property Loss Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR Property Loss Notice Redacted |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Crisitian Baquedano Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) Robert Kreitzer (2017) Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Altitude by Scott Robinson Deposition Transcript. |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Creative Christmas by Joseph Capone Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #002) Cabrera Amended Complaint (8.6.2015) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Cabrera Amended Complaint (8.6.2015) Redacted |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #002) Kreitzer's Answer to Amended Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #002) UPS's Answer to Amended Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #002) Lincoln Square's BOP Demand to Cabrera |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Boom Lift Manual |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Picture of Boom Lift Label |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Light Contract |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Lincoln Square by William Murphy Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #001) UPS's Third-Party Complaint (Cabrera) Redacted per 22 NYCRR UPS's Third-Party Complaint (Cabrera) Redacted |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Creative Christmas by Joseph Capone Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #001) UPS's Combined Demands to Altitude |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #001) Cabrera's Amended Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR Cabrera's Amended Complaint Redacted |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion #001) Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR Police Accident Report Redacted |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #001) Altitude's Answer to Cabrera's Amended Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion #001) 5.19.2016 Preliminary Conference Order |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion #001) 1.22.2016 Preliminary Conference Order |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion #001) Cabrera's Note of Issue |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #001) Altitude's Answer to Third Party Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #001) UPS's Third-Party Complaint (Alterra) |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Crisitian Baquedano Deposition Transcript |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #001) Altitude's Answer to Third Party Complaint (Alterra) |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - FF (Motion #001) Alterra's Note of Issue |
|
June 07, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
June 07, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
June 07, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) Stipulation to adjourn motion to 7/8/19 |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003) Stipulation to adjourn motion to 7/8/19 |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002) Stipulation to adjourn motion to 7/8/19 |
|
May 09, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
May 08, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
May 08, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1K) Dr. Reiser Affidavit in Support of Summary Judgment |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1K) Affidavit of M. Kuzel in Support of Summary Judgment |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support of Altitude's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1K) Affidavit of W. Neale in Support of Summary Judgment |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgement and Affirmation in Support of Summary Judgement |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Verified Answer to Amended Complaint on behalf of Defendant Lincoln Square |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #003) UPS's Answer to Alterra Complaint with Cross Claims |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #003) Alterra - Note of Issue |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #003) Kretizer's Answer to Alterra Complaint |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #003) UPS's Third-Party Complaint (Alterra) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - GG (Motion #003) Salinas Autopsy Report |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - FF (Motion #003) Salinas Death Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR Salinas Death Certificate Redacted |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G-1 (Motion #002) Part 1 EBT Transcript of Lincoln Square by William Murphy |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - (Cabrera Action) UPS-Kreizer's Third-Party S + VC 6.10.15 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) UPS's Third-Party Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - (Cabrera Action) Altitude's Answer to TPC (& Initial Demands) 7.24.15 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Altitude's Answer to Third Party Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - (Cabrera Action) S + VC 4.1.15 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B-1 (Motion #001) Exhibit B [Part 1] (Cabrera Action) UPS' Answer w Cross-Claims 6.10.15 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) Log Entry |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #001) Exhibit Q - Dep Transcript of Altitude (Scott Robinson) 5.4.17 [Mini] |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Exhibit L - Cabrera's Note of Issue 12.28.18 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #001) Exhibit P - Hold Harmless Rental Agreement 10.31.13 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B-2 (Motion #001) Exhibit B [Part 2] (Cabrera Action) Kreitzer's Answer w Cross-Claims 6.10.15 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service re Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #001) Exhibit O - JLG invoice for SJ660 12-30-2011 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Exhibit J - Order re prior EBT transcripts 7.20.17 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Exhibit I - Amended Decision and Order (re Consolidation) 12.8.15 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - QQ (Motion #003) Wilmer Cabrera Deposition Transcript Excerpts Redacted per 22 NYCRR Wilmer Cabrera Deposition Transcript Excerpts Redacted |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1K) M. Kuzel CV |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - UU (Motion #003) Stipulation regarding liability determination |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - PP (Motion #003) Lincoln Square by Jose Bermudez Deposition Transcript Excerpts |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #003) Altitude's 2nd 3rd-Party Complaint v. Creative Christmas (Alterra) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1K) Graphics and Photographs |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1K) W. Neale CV |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - OO (Motion #003) Lincoln Square by William Murphy Deposition Transcript Excerpts |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - NN (Motion #003) Creative Christmas by Joseph Capone Deposition Transcript Excerpts |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion #003) The Boom Lift Agreement |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - LL (Motion #003) Robert Oliver Deposition Transcript Excerpts |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - JJ (Motion #003) Kreitzer (2014) Deposition Transcript Excerpts |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhibit E - (Cabrera Action) P's Supp Summons + Am Ver Complaint 8.6.15 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1K) Dr. Reiser CV |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G-2 (Motion #001) Exhibit G [Part 2] (Cabrera Action) Kreitzer's Amended Verified Answer w Cross-claims to Am Complain Exhibit G [Part 2] (Cabrera Action) Kreitzer's Amended Verified Answer w Cross-claims to Am Complain ... show more |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Exhibit F - Altitude's Answer to Am. Ver. Complaint 8.13.15 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Exhibit H - (Cabrera Action) Lincoln's Verified Answer w Cross-claim to Am Ver Complaint 10.22.15 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G-1 (Motion #001) Exhibit G [Part 1] (Cabrera Action) UPS' Amended Verified Answer w Cross-claims to Am Complaint 8.17 Exhibit G [Part 1] (Cabrera Action) UPS' Amended Verified Answer w Cross-claims to Am Complaint 8.17 ... show more |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) Exhibit M - Stipulation re Determination |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #001) Exhibit N - So-ordered Letter extending time to file MSJs 2.11.19 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #001) Exhibit X - Chen Affidavit |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #001) Exhibit R - Dep Transcript of Christian Baquedano 8.26.2014 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion #001) Exhibit - AA - (Alterra Action) UPS's Answer |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion #001) Exhibit - BB - (Alterra Action) Kreitzer's Answer |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #001) Exhibit S - JLG's Operation and Safety Manual for SJ660 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #001) Exhibit U - Dep Transcript of Creative Christmas (Robert Catalano) 9.12.2014 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #001) Exhibit T - (Cabrera Action) Cabrera's 2nd Supp Ver BP 5.27.18 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #001) Exhibit V - Dep Transcript of Creative Christmas (Joseph Capone) 9.12.2014 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1K) W. Neale Report |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion #001) Exhibit - EE - (Alterra Action) Altitude's Answer |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #001) Exhibit W - past invoices |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #001) Exhibit Y - Levine Affidavit |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #001) Exhibit Z - Alterra Complaint |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion #001) Exhibit - DD - (Alterra Action) Lincoln Square's Answer |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion #001) Exhibit - CC - (Alterra Action) UPS's TPC |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G-2 (Motion #002) Part 2 EBT Transcript of Lincoln Square by William Murphy |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #003) Altitude's Answer to UPS's 3rd Party Complaint (Alterra) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Exhibit K - (Cabrera Action) FILED 2nd TPS & Ver. 2nd TPC 12.20.18 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #002) EBT Transcript of Robert A. Kreitzer, Jr. |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #003) Alterra's Complaint |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #003) Stipulation of Discontinuance (UPSGS) (Alterra Action) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Answers of co-defendant and second third-party complaint |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #002) EBT Transcript of Cristian Baquedano |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Court Order Dated February 11, 2019 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #002) EBT Transcript of Joseph Capone |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Lincoln Square's Answer to Amended Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affirmation of Service |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Cabrera Amended Complaint (8.6.2015) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Cabrera Amended Complaint (8.6.2015) Redacted |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) Contract between Lincoln Square and Creative Christmas |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Note of Issue and Certificate of Readiness |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Order dated July 20, 2017 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Altitude's Answer to Amended Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) UPS's Answer to Amended Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Kreitzer's Answer to Amended Complaint (Cabrera) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Altitude's 2nd 3rd Party Complaint v. Creative Christmas (Cabrera) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) UPS's Demand for Bill of Particulars to Cabrera |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #003) Cabrera's Response to Post-Dep Demands Redacted per 22 NYCRR Cabrera's Response to Post-Dep Demands Redacted |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) Cabrera's Supp. BOP to UPS (4.4.2016) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #003) UPS's Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars to Alterra (Alterra Action) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion #003) The Light Agreement |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - II (Motion #003) Diagram marked at Baquedano deposition |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - SS (Motion #003) NYC Rules 4-13 |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - HH (Motion #003) Crisitian Baquedano Deposition Transcript Excerpts |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - TT (Motion #003) MUTCD- Chapters 6C and 6E |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion #003) Portion of NYPD Investigation File Redacted per 22 NYCRR Portion of NYPD Investigation File Redacted |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - MM (Motion #003) UPS by Anthony Cordle Deposition Transcript Excerpts |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - KK (Motion #003) Kreitzer (2017) Deposition Transcript Excerpts |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #003) Lincoln Square's Answer to UPS 3rd Party Complaint (Alterra) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - RR (Motion #003) Altitude by Scott Robinson Deposition Transcript Excerpts |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Supplemental Summons and Amended Verified Complaint |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Cabrera's BOP to UPS (12.8.2015) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Cabrera's BOP to UPS (12.8.2015) Redacted |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #003) UPS's post-deposition demands to Cabrera (6.13.2017) Redacted per 22 NYCRR UPS's post-deposition demands to Cabrera (6.13.2017) Redacted |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #003) Alterra's Bill of Particulars to UPS (Alterra Action) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #003) Cabrera's 2nd Supp BOP (5.27.2016) |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion #003) Portion of OSHA Investitigation File |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion #003) Portion of St. Lukes-Roosevelt Hospital Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR Portion of St. Lukes-Roosevelt Hospital Records Redacted |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #002) EBT Transcript of Robert Catalano |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #003) Cabrera - Note of issue |
|
April 08, 2019 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 07/20/2020SEE DECISION Before Justice: GOETZ, PAUL A. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
April 08, 2019 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) Decided: 07/20/2020SEE DECISION Before Justice: GOETZ, PAUL A. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
April 08, 2019 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #003) Decided: 07/20/2020SEE DECISION Before Justice: GOETZ, PAUL A. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Due Diligence |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Re: global deadline for dispostive motions |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Goetz requesting correction to the deadline to file dispositive motions in the Cabre Letter to Judge Goetz requesting correction to the deadline to file dispositive motions in the Cabre ... show more |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D- (Cabrera)Stip cancelling status conf 1.3.19 |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C- (Alterra) So-ordered Stipulation 1.3.19 |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B- Discovery Order for both actions 12.6.18 |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E- Notes of Issues and Altitude's Jury Demand 1.22.19 |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Consolidation Order 12.8.15 |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Setting Note of Issue deadline |
|
January 03, 2019 | hearing |
DISCOVERY COMPLETED STATUS CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to cancel Status Conference on 1/3/19 |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOI, Certificate of Readiness, Affirmation & Stipulation |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B- Kreitzer's Answers and Cross-Claims |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Second Third-Party Summons and Verified Second Third-Party Complaint |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E- Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D- Altitude's Verified Answer with Cross-claims |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C- Kreitzer's Third Party Complaint |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G- Lincoln's Verified Answer and Cross-Claims |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F- Altitude's Answer to Amended Verified Complaint with Cross-Claims |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Exhibit I- Cabrera's Motion for Default Judgement and Stay on Damages and the Court's Order |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Exhibit H- Related Action Complaint |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J Exhibit J- Hold Harmless Rental Agreement |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
December 06, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 04, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 21, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
March 29, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE New Part Rules |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
October 19, 2017 | hearing |
ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: EDWARDS, ERIKA M. |
|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 20, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: EDWARDS, ERIKA M. |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
April 27, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: EDWARDS, ERIKA M. |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
November 10, 2016 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: WRIGHT, GEOFFREY D. |
|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
May 19, 2016 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 47 9:30 AM Judge: WRIGHT, GEOFFREY D. |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
January 22, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM 9:30 W/152547/15 Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES Kings County Minutes |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE Certified copy from New York County on Index 152547/2015 |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Exhibit C - Letter dated July 1, 2015 |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion, Attorney's Affirmation and Supporting Papers |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Exhibit D - Affidavit of Livienne Stewart |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion for Default Judgment, Attorney's Affirmation in Support & Plaintiff's Affidavit of Notice of Motion for Default Judgment, Attorney's Affirmation in Support & Plaintiff's Affidavit of ... show more |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service of S&C |
|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant Robert A. Kreitzer, Jr.'s Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.'s Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
APPENDIX redaction sheet |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) Supplemental Summons |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
APPENDIX REDACTION |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
THIRD PARTY NOTICE OF APPEARANCE THIRDPARTY NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
THIRD-PARTY ANSWER verified answer to third party complaint |
|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Third-Party Complaint (Altitude Equipment Rentals LLC) |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1K) Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's third cause of action for punitive damages |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer of Defendant Robert A. Kreitzer, Jr. |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation adjourning time to Answer |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1K) Affirmation of Thomas O. O'Connor in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's third cause of action Affirmation of Thomas O. O'Connor in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's third cause of action ... show more |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer of Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA) RJI previously filed in Kings County |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1K) Plaintiff's Verified Complaint |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | RJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY) | |
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service - S&C - Robert A Kreitzer, Jr. |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service - S&C - Creative Christmas, Inc. |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service - S&C - United Parcel Service, Inc. |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service - S&C - Lincoln Square Condominium |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |