Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York v. Rapid Auto Sales Inc
On November 24, 2016 a workers comp app for judgement case was filed by Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York, represented by Mcginn, James R, against Rapid Auto Sales Inc, in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 24, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 07, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Workers Comp App for Judgement
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Workers Compensation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Dec 12, 2016WORKERS COMPENSATION APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 24, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 12, 2016 | |
November 24, 2016 | Docket Event | WORKERS COMPENSATION APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT |