Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York v. Clique Diner Inc
A Workers Comp App For Judgement case was filed by Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York, represented by Herron, Scott A, against Clique Diner Inc, in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 04, 2007
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Category
Workers Comp App for Judgement
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Workers Compensation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Dec 14, 2007WORKERS COMPENSATION APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: Dec 04, 2007Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2007 | Judgment entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 06, 2007 | ||
December 04, 2007 |
WORKERS COMPENSATION APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT Judgment Package |