Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York v. Forum Trading Corp
On October 27, 2010 a workers comp app for judgement case was filed by Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York, represented by Mcginn, James R, against Forum Trading Corp, in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 27, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Workers Comp App for Judgement
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Workers Compensation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 08, 2010WORKERS COMPENSATION APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: Oct 27, 2010Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 08, 2010 | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
WORKERS COMPENSATION APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT Judgment Package |