Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Svetlana Travis v. Plaza Hotel, Ny
A Torts - Other (Transfer) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Paul A. Goetz presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 17, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Category
Torts - Other (Transfer)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jan 26, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jun 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jun 15, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: May 17, 2023TRANSFER OF FILE ON CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: May 17, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 28, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: scan all subpoenaed files |
||
June 15, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 17, 2023 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
May 17, 2023 | TRANSFER OF FILE ON CHANGE OF VENUE |