Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The City Of New York v. The Land And Building Known As 235 East 60th Street, Tax Block #1415, Tax Lot #17, County Of New York, City And State Of New York, 235 East 60th Street Llc, John Doe, Jane Doe
On February 14, 2020 a special proceedings - other (nuisance abatement) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge James Edward D'Auguste presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 14, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. James Edward D'Auguste
Category
Special Proceedings - Other (Nuisance Abatement)
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: May 27, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 26, 2021DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 26, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: May 26, 2021URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: Mar 20, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Feb 18, 2020SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 14, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Feb 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 2
Date: Feb 14, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: Feb 14, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: Feb 14, 2020ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Feb 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Feb 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 3
Date: Feb 14, 2020AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: Feb 14, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: Feb 14, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT NOTICE OF ADR OPTIONS- PART 55 |
||
May 26, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 26, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 26, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
July 15, 2020 | hearing |
(Motion #001) IAS MOTION PART 55 9;30AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
March 25, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION PART 55 9;30AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
February 24, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION PART 55 9;30AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
February 24, 2020 | Motion |
PREL INJUNCTION/TEMP REST ORDR (Motion #001) Before Justice: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD Answer demanded: No Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit of Undercover Detective 406 |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Copy of Deed |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit of Det. Jiang |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) |