Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Commissioners Of The State Insurance Fund v. Jttm Communications Corp.
A Contract (Non-Commercial) case was filed by Commissioners Of The State Insurance Fund, represented by Mingione, Ernest R., against Jttm Communications Corp., in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 28, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Category
Contract (Non-Commercial)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
7 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Oct 16, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 28, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 28, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2015 | Notice of Entry of Judgment | ||
October 16, 2014 | Judgment entered in the Office of the County Clerk on October 16, 2014. | ||
October 07, 2014 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No Fee Authorization Letter |
||
October 07, 2014 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Final Invoice |
||
October 07, 2014 | Affirmation to Waive Collection Costs | ||
October 07, 2014 | Affirmation of Account Stated | ||
October 07, 2014 | Affirmation of Mailing S&C | ||
April 04, 2014 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 28, 2014 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
February 28, 2014 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 28, 2014 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |