Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
136 East 55th Street, Inc v. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York
On October 20, 2010 a tax certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 20, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Duration
1 year, 8 months and 27 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Jul 17, 2012TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED
Date: Oct 20, 2010Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED |