Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The Trustees Of Columbia University v. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York
On October 13, 2010 a tax certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 13, 2010
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Duration
4 years, 9 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 28, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Jul 28, 2015TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED
Date: Oct 13, 2010Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED |