Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
865 United Nations Condom v. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York
On October 11, 2010 a tax certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 11, 2010
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Duration
4 years, 3 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 26, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Jan 26, 2015TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED
Date: Oct 11, 2010Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
October 11, 2010 | Docket Event | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED |