Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Paul Reid v. 133 Equities Llc., Do Right Construction Corp., K&R Realty Management Llc
A Torts - Other (Construction Accident) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 14, 2016
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Category
Torts - Other (construction accident)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Construction
Case Duration
4 months and 1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Feb 24, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 02, 2016SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 14, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2017 |
PROOF OF SERVICE cplr3215g4i&ii Notice RE SERVICE |
||
February 24, 2017 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
||
December 09, 2016 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 02, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 02, 2016 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 14, 2016 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint |