Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Doris Hagood v. New York City Housing Authority
On November 14, 2016 a torts - other negligence (premises negligence) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Margaret Pui Yee Chan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 14, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Other Negligence (Premises Negligence)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 9 months and 20 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - OTHER
Date: Sep 05, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Aug 30, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: May 17, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: May 17, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: May 16, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: May 16, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: May 16, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: May 15, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: May 15, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: Apr 23, 2019DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 14, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Feb 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 30, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 30, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jul 28, 2017ANSWER
Date: Jan 18, 2017SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 14, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No Fee Authorization Letter |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Voluntary Discontinuance |
|
July 23, 2019 | hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL JUDICIAL MEDIATION 9:30 95K Judge: KAPLAN, DEBORAH ANN |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 014 |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 015 |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 013 |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 011 |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 012 |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 008 |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 009 |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 007 |
|
April 11, 2019 | hearing |
TRANSFERRED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
March 15, 2019 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
January 18, 2019 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
November 19, 2018 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
May 16, 2018 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 33 10 AM ORAL ARG Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
March 07, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 10 AM ORAL ARG Judge: SCHECTER, JENNIFER G. |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Correspondence with Authorization |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support |
|
January 30, 2018 | Motion |
STRIKE (Motion #001) Decided: 05/16/2018SEE DECISION Before Justice: CHAN, MARGARET A. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #001) No Fee Letter |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) PC Order |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Deposition Transcript |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) October 17, 2017 letter |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) April 19, 2017 letter |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Note of Issue |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Bill of Particulars |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation in Good Faith |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
July 26, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 57 Judge: SCHECTER, JENNIFER G. |
|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
May 17, 2017 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 57 Judge: SCHECTER, JENNIFER G. |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
February 16, 2017 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 46 2:15PM Judge: BILLINGS, LUCY |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |