Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Edgardo F. Lora v. Roadway Movers Inc, Fredy Flores Guzman
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge James G Clynes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 02, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 31, 2024
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 21, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 21, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: Sep 25, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Sep 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 11, 2023ANSWER
Date: Sep 07, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: Sep 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 16, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 02, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS via NYSCEF |
||
December 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support |
||
December 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS via E-Mail & Mail |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) A (Lora Initial Pleadings) |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) B (Taveras Initial Pleadings) |
||
December 21, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
||
September 25, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
September 25, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FREDY FLORES GUZMAN |
||
September 07, 2023 | Answer | ||
September 07, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands |
||
August 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROADWAY MOVERS INC |
||
August 16, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 02, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |