Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lorena Lourdes Aquino Carbo v. Subin Associates Llp
A Special Proceedings - Other (Transfer File) case was filed by Lorena Lourdes Aquino Carbo, represented by Garcia, Rene G., against Subin Associates Llp, in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Verna L. Saunders presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 17, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 22, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Category
Special Proceedings - Other (Transfer file)
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Sep 26, 2022STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: Sep 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 30, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Aug 29, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 17, 2022PETITION
Date: Aug 17, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Aug 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Aug 17, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Aug 17, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 13, 2022 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE | ||
August 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service via Certified Mail |
||
August 29, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 17, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | ||
August 17, 2022 | PETITION | ||
August 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Substitution Correspondence to SUBIN |
||
August 17, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |