Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lea Jahns v. May Elizabeth Llc d/b/a Restaurant Juventino, Rebecca Uberti, Juventino Avila
On June 03, 2014 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 03, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Case Duration
5 months and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Dec 01, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 03, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |