Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nyctl 2018-A Trust, The Bank Of New York Mellon , as Collateral Agent and Custodian for the NYCTL 2018-A TRUST v. Eaton Benevolent Society Of New York, Inc., New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Department Of Finance, John Doe No…
On February 14, 2020 a real property - tax foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 14, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Real Property - Tax Foreclosure
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
General Tax
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 16, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Feb 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Feb 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Feb 14, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Feb 14, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Defendant John Doe No 1 |
||
August 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Eaton Benevolent Society of New York, Inc. |
||
August 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant New York City Environmental Control Board |
||
August 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant New York City Department of Finance |
||
August 16, 2021 | Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing | ||
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C List of Judgments |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Recording and Tax Lien Certificate |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B New York Tax Liens |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Pendency of Action |