Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Anthony Lopez Sr v. The City Of New York, Hidden City Cafe Corp., Grammercy Star Cafe, Bldg Partnership, 76 L.P., Alex 23 Lexington Corporation D/B/A Gramercy Star Cafe
On February 22, 2016 a torts - other negligence (trip & fall) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Alexander M Tisch presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 22, 2016
Last Refreshed
January 11, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Other Negligence (Trip & Fall)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 year, 5 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 07, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 01, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Dec 07, 2016ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: Jul 26, 2016RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: Jun 24, 2016DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jun 24, 2016COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Jun 24, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jun 08, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 06, 2016COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Apr 04, 2016SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 22, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Name |
|
August 09, 2017 | hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2PM PENDING SETTLEMENT. Judge: TISCH, ALEXANDER M. (DCM) |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
April 05, 2017 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ADJOURND COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2PM Judge: TISCH, ALEXANDER M. (DCM) |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
November 09, 2016 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2PM Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. (DCM) |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR: | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant BLDG's Answer to Amended Complaint |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Summons & Complaint |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |