Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
American Transit Insurance Company v. Emre Yucel, Astoria Pain Management, Pllc, Crescent Radiology, Pllc, Pappas Physical Medicine And Rehabilitation Pllc, Stand-Up Mri Of East Elmhurst, P.C., Universal Pain Management, P.C.
On January 29, 2014 a contract (non-commercial) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Cynthia S Kern presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 29, 2014
Last Refreshed
January 26, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Contract (Non-Commercial)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 6 months and 17 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Aug 17, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Jul 29, 2015UNFILED JUDGMENT (Motion 001)
Date: May 01, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 10, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 10, 2015SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 29, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military Investigation | |
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
UNFILED JUDGMENT (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, UNFILED JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 01, 2015 |
|
April 16, 2015 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 04/30/2015CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: KERN, CYNTHIA S. Answer demanded: No Judge: KERN, CYNTHIA S. |
|
April 16, 2015 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: KERN, CYNTHIA S. |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service for Motion |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Follow-Up Mailing Affidavits |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Pleadings |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Denial of Claim |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Scheduling Letters |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Copy of Policy |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavits in Support |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service for RJI |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT SOS AFFS |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EIP |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |