Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Robert Ocasio v. Motor Vehicle Accident Indemnification Corporation
On January 10, 2014 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Manuel J. Mendez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 10, 2014
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 month and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 04, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 16, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 10, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: Jan 10, 2014RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Jan 10, 2014PETITION
Date: Jan 10, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 04 |
|
February 26, 2014 | Motion |
LEAVE TO SUE (Motion #001) Decided: 02/28/2014CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. Answer demanded: No Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
February 26, 2014 | hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 13EFM 9;30AM Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 16, 201 |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - E | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - D | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - C | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - B | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - A |