Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Board Of Directors Of Fifth And Fifty-Fifth Residence Club Association Inc., For Itself And On Behalf Of All Club Unit Owners v. Helecho Inc., Board Of Managers Of Fifty And Fifty-Fifth Condominium, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance,…
On January 08, 2019 an other real property - non-mortgage foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge James Edward D'Auguste presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. James Edward D'Auguste
Category
Other Real Property - Non-Mortgage Foreclosure
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Overview
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Jul 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Jul 22, 2022AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: Jul 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Jul 22, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: Jul 22, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: Jul 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Jul 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Jul 22, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: Apr 29, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: Jan 19, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: May 27, 2021URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: Mar 20, 2020JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: May 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: May 23, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: May 23, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: May 23, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 08, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Jan 08, 2019SUMMONS
Date: Jan 08, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Referee's Oath (Computation) and Report of Amount Due with Schedule of Documentary Evidence |
||
July 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Keri Truman with Exhibits attached |
||
July 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
July 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
July 22, 2022 |
REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Referee's Oath (Computation) and Report of Amount Due |
||
July 22, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Order and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale [and to Confirm Referee's Report] (Proposed) |
||
July 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Copy of Order of Reference [Appointing Referee] |
||
July 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Copy of Notice of Pendency |
||
April 29, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Part 55 In Person Appearance Notice. |
||
January 19, 2022 |
ORDER - REFERENCE Order of Reference |
||
May 27, 2021 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT NOTICE OF ADR OPTIONS- PART 55 |
||
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
August 07, 2019 | hearing |
IAS PRELIMINARYCONFERENCE 55 10 AM W/150206/19 ET ANO Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Order of Reference and Appointment of Referee |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A - Residence Club Declaration |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Ex I - Notice of Additional Mailing with Proof of Service |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Ex H - Proof of Service of Process upon All Specifically-Named Defendants |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex B - Club Unit Description |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Ex C - Deed to Helecho Inc. |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Ex F - Summons & Verified Complaint |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Andrea Cortes-Ramos, sworn to 5/16/2019, in Support of Application | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Ex E - Recorded Lien & Affidavit of Service |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Edward M. Shapiro, Esq., dated 5/22/2019, in Support of Application | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Ex D - Arrears Report |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Ex G - Notice of Pendency |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER Application for Appointment of Referee and Order of Reference upon Defendants' Defaults |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Supersedes and Replaces Document # 4 -- Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Not Supersedes and Replaces Document # 4 -- Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Not ... show more |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service of Notice of Additional Mailing upon all Defendants pursuant to CPLR 3215 (g Affirmation of Service of Notice of Additional Mailing upon all Defendants pursuant to CPLR 3215 (g ... show more |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Additional Mailing of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice of Pendency upon all Defenda Notice of Additional Mailing of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice of Pendency upon all Defenda ... show more |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice of Pendency upon Defendant Board of Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice of Pendency upon Defendant Board of ... show more |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice of Pendency upon Defendant Helecho I Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice of Pendency upon Defendant Helecho I ... show more |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice of Pendency upon Defendant New York Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice of Pendency upon Defendant New York ... show more |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Verified Complaint - Nonpayment of Club Charges Timeshare Lien Foreclosure |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Block 1290, Lot 1233 |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |