Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
John P Kapsalis v. Katherine Kapsalis
A Matrimonial - Contested case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Erica L presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
June 10, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Erica L
Category
Matrimonial - Contested
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 | Notice of Appearance (POST RJI) | ||
May 03, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
March 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 06, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
March 03, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
March 03, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
March 03, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 03, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - H | ||
March 03, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - G | ||
March 03, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - F | ||
March 03, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - B | ||
March 03, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
March 03, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - E | ||
March 03, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - D | ||
March 03, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - C | ||
February 21, 2023 | Notice of Appearance (POST RJI) | ||
December 21, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 01, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
September 23, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
September 22, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
August 18, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
June 21, 2022 | STIPULATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
June 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 31, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
March 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
February 24, 2022 | STIPULATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 24, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
February 16, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
February 14, 2022 | STIPULATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 07, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 07, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 03, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL | ||
November 29, 2021 | hearing |
Judge: Prager, Hon. Erica L. |
|
November 24, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL (PROPOSED) | ||
November 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
October 27, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
October 21, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 21, 2021 | ORDER - RECUSAL | ||
October 20, 2021 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
October 18, 2021 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
October 18, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 18, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
September 16, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
September 08, 2021 | Notice of Appearance (PRE RJI) | ||
September 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2021 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
July 29, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
July 29, 2021 | MAINTENANCE GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | ||
July 29, 2021 | NOTICE CONCERNING CONTINUATION OF HEALTH CARE COVERAGE | ||
July 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC ORDERS | ||
July 29, 2021 | Summons WITH NOTICE |