Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jerome Mcgoey v. Beerco Limited D/B/A Beerco Restaurant LLC, D/B/A Belgian Beer Cafe
On December 26, 2019 a torts - other (slip and fall) case was filed by Jerome Mcgoey, represented by Hazelton, Donald H., against Beerco Limited D B A Beerco Restaurant Llc, D B A Belgian Beer Cafe, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 26, 2019
Last Refreshed
December 20, 2022
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Other (slip and fall)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Duration
21 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 16, 2020SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 26, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |