Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Td Bank, N.A. v. Elizabeth Abbate
On December 09, 2019 an other matters - consumer credit (card) original creditor plaintiff case was filed by Td Bank, N.A., represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Elizabeth Abbate, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 09, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Case Duration
1 month and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ANSWER
Date: Jan 09, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 31, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 09, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ELIZABETH ABBATE |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |