Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nationstar Mortgage Llc D/B/A MR. COOPER v. David Burger A/K/A DAVID M. BURGER, John Doe
On December 04, 2019 a real property - mortgage foreclosure - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Fsp-J presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 04, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Fsp-J
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: Mar 20, 2020ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: Mar 06, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 19, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 04, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2020 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) MOTION FORECLOSURE PART ODISREV Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
October 14, 2020 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION/CANCEL N.P. (Motion #001) Before Justice: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT Answer demanded: Yes Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
September 24, 2020 | hearing |
FORECLOSURE-SP SETTLEMENT CONF
Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE | |
June 08, 2020 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE-SP SETTLEMENT CONF 9:30 AM Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
April 30, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED FORECLOSURE-SP SETTLEMENT CONF 9:30 AM Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | |
February 10, 2020 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE-SP SETTLEMENT CONF 2:00 PM Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 aff-Donna Burger s/h/a Jane Doe #1 |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 Affidavit-Donna Burger s/h/a Jane Doe #1 |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-Donna Burger s/h/a Jane Doe #1 |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 Affidavit-DAVID BURGER AKA DAVID M. BURGER |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service-DAVID BURGER AKA DAVID M. BURGER |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) Redacted |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted |