Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Steven Haddock v. Executive Snow Control, Llc
A Torts - Other (Premises) case was filed by Steven Haddock, represented by Dell, Joseph Gerard, against Executive Snow Control, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 26, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Torts - Other (Premises)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a summons and verified complaint filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Steven Haddock, is suing the defendant, Executive Snow Control, LLC, for negligence and breach of duty. The c…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 11, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 26, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EXECUTIVE SNOW CONTROL, LLC |
||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EXECUTIVE SNOW CONTROL, LLC |
||
October 11, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 26, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint |