Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Patrick Dinko v. Andrea Christina Dinko
A Torts - Other (Conversion) case was filed by Patrick Dinko, represented by Syed, Masood Akhtar, against Andrea Christina Dinko, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Philippe Solages presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 01, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Philippe Solages
Category
Torts - Other (Conversion)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Economic Torts
Overview
This is an action for declaratory relief as well as recovery for damages
stemming from the wrongful acts by Defendant ANDREA CHRISTINA DINKO, and others,
with respect to their attempted theft of property of Plaintiff PATRICK DINKO (“Plaintiff”),
bad faith, and their colluded efforts to strip Plaintiffs of their assets and reputation.
Plaintiff, sometimes referred herein as “Patrick Dinko or “Mr. Dinko,” is the
son of defendant, Andrea Christina Dinko, sometimes referred herein as “Andrea Dinko” or
“Ms. Dinko”.
This action arises out of Defendant’s mismanagement and misappropriation of
Plaintiff’s assets, her breach of fiduciary duty, and other malfeasance.
The defendant, ANDREA CHRISTINA DINKO is the mother of the plaintiff
Causes of Action
1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY
2. CONVERSION
3. UNJUST ENRICHMENT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Patrick Dinko, is suing the defendant, Andrea Christina Dinko, for breach of fiduciary duty and conversion. The complaint all…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ANSWER
Date: Jan 25, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jan 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 001) Proof of Check Deposit Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jan 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 17, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jan 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 17, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Jan 17, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 13, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
January 17, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service - Andrea Christina Dinko LI |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service - Additional Mailing |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Proof of Check Deposit Redacted per 22 NYCRR Proof of Check Deposit Redacted |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Settlement Check to Plaintiff Redacted per 22 NYCRR Settlement Check to Plaintiff Redacted |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service - Andrea Christina Dinko NJ |
||
January 17, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
January 17, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
October 23, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 13, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |