Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ferraro Foods, Inc. v. Pizza Cucina Latina Corp., Marlo Yanez
An Other Matters - Contract - Other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 01, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Contract - Other
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Judgment (Other)
Overview
Causes of Action
ALLEGATIONS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION
1. BREACH OF CONTRACT
2. PERSONAL GUARANTEE
3. ACCOUNT STATED
4. ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, by Ferraro Foods, Inc. against Pizza Cucina Latina Corp. and Marlo Yanez. The complaint alleges breach of contract, personal guarantee, account stated, and …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 30, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Nov 28, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: Nov 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Sep 13, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Sep 13, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 28, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Default Judgment Proposal |
||
November 27, 2023 | affirmation of non-military service | ||
October 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service(ind) |
||
October 18, 2023 | Affidavit of Additional Mailing | ||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service(bus) |
||
September 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Agreement Redacted |
||
September 13, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
September 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Account |