Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jason Lopez v. Amalia Legaspi Valero, Anaiah Valero, Mikey L. Feldman and, James Mitchell
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Rhonda E Fischer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 01, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Jason Lopez, is suing the defendants Amalia Legaspi Valero, Anaiah Valero, Mikey L. Feldman, and James Mitchell. The complaint alleges person…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 08, 2024DEPOSITION SCHEDULE RIDER
Date: Dec 19, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: Nov 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 02, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Nov 02, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Oct 05, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: Oct 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: Oct 04, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: Oct 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: Sep 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: Sep 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 18, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Sep 18, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 13, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 19, 2023 | DEPOSITION SCHEDULE RIDER | ||
November 17, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 02, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 02, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 05, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 05, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 04, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
October 04, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: combined demands for autho for D & I |
||
September 28, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT ATTY CERTIFICATION |
||
September 21, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
September 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 18, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 13, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |