Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Marie Ducenat v. Joseph N. Jackson Jr
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 01, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Marie Ducenat, is suing the defendant, Joseph N. Jackson Jr., for personal injuries sustained in a motor vehicle collision. T…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Nov 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: Nov 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 18, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 13, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 03, 2023 |
ANSWER with demands |
||
November 03, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Joseph Jackson, Jr. |
||
September 13, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |