Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Allstate Insurance Company v. Jennifer Goldstein
A Special Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Dawn Jimenez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 01, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Dawn Jimenez
Category
Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 75
Practice Area
Arbitration
Matter Type
General Arbitration
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a petition filed by Allstate Insurance Company to stay arbitration in a case involving Jennifer Goldstein. Allstate Insurance Company is represented by attorney Jeffrey Kadushin of Marshall & Marshall, PLLC. The petition states …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: Jan 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 19, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 18, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: Jan 18, 2024CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 07, 2023PETITION
Date: Sep 05, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: Sep 05, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: Sep 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Sep 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Sep 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C police report Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Sep 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Sep 05, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | ORDER - RECUSAL | ||
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Reply Affirmation |
||
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) REPLY AFFIRMATION |
||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Allstate Policy |
||
January 18, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Stipulation |
||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Police Report |
||
January 18, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
October 09, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
September 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 05, 2023 |
PETITION verified petition in support |
||
September 05, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
September 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) | ||
September 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D insurance cards |
||
September 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B demand for arbitration |
||
September 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C police report Redacted per 22 NYCRR police report Redacted |
||
September 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A policy |