Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Robert Gingold v. H.R.E. Motor Cars Inc., Shirley Andrews
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Felice Muraca presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 02, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Overview
Causes of Action
Allegations Common to All Causes of Action
1. Breach of Contract
2. Property Damage
4. Diminished Value
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Robert Gingold, is suing H.R.E Motor Cars Inc. and Shirley Andrews as defendants. The complaint alleges that Gingold owns a 1…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
DEPOSITION SCHEDULE RIDER
Date: Jan 22, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: Jan 02, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Nov 16, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: Nov 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: Oct 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 14, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 05, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | DEPOSITION SCHEDULE RIDER | ||
January 02, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 16, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 16, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 19, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
September 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 14, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE H.R.E. Motor Cars Inc. |
||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |