Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Joseph Arce v. Alpha Diallo, Boubacar Diallo
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 25, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Joseph Arce, is suing the defendants, Alpha Diallo and Boubacar Diallo. The complaint alleges that the defendants were negligent in their own…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: Nov 08, 2023ANSWER
Date: Oct 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 21, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 05, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) | ||
October 04, 2023 | Answer, Demand for BP, EBT Notice, Combined Demands ... | ||
September 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |