Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Brendan Puderbach v. Chen Xiaochang
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 30, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Brendan Puderbach, is suing the defendant, Chen Xiaochang, for negligence in a car accident that occurred on August 18, 2023.…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ANSWER
Date: Dec 04, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Oct 12, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: Sep 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 25, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 05, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Answer with Defendant Discovery Demands | ||
October 12, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
September 25, 2023 |
CONSENT TO EFILING Statement of Authorization For Electronic Filing |
||
September 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS SUMMONS.COMPLAINT _ CHEN XIAOCHANG |
||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |