Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For Soundview Home Loan Trust 2006-Opt5, Assetbacked Certificates, Series 2006-Opt5 v. Cynthia Ormsby A/K/A CYNTHIA V. ORMSBY, Capital One Bank (Usa) Na, Midland Funding Of Delaware Llc, Midland Fundi…
A Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Nassau Fp2
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Overview
This action is brought and pursuant to Article 13 of the Real Property and
Proceedings Law for foreclosure of the mortgage dated March 22, 2006 and recorded on June 15,
2006, at Liber M30615 Page 577 in the Public Records of the County of Nassau, State of New
York (hereinafter referred to as the “Subject Mortgage”). The Mortgage Tax was duly paid.
The premises which forms the subject of this action is fully described in Schedule
“A” attached hereto.
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as trustee for Soundview Home Loan Trust 2006-OPT5, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-OPT5, against Cynthia Ormsby, Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Midland Fund…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
COURT NOTICE
Date: Jan 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 01, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: Oct 30, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: Oct 30, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Oct 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: Oct 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 02, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 02, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: Sep 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Sep 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Sep 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTERS
Date: Sep 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Sep 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: Sep 05, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: Sep 05, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 05, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service for RJI |
||
October 30, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
October 30, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
October 30, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF INVESTIGATION UPON CYNTHIA ORMSBY |
||
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM 3215 CYNTHIA ORMSBY |
||
October 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS AMERICAN SECURITY TECHNOLOGIES |
||
October 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE |
||
October 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos midland funding llc |
||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS AFFIXED JOHN DOE #2 BASEMENT |
||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM JOHN DOE #3 |
||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM JOHN DOE #2 |
||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM JHN DOE #3 TENANT MAILINGS |
||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS AFFIX JOHN DOE #3 |
||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM JOHN DOE JD #2 TENANT MAILING |
||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANT |
||
October 05, 2023 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AOM JUNIOR ORMBSY S/H/A/ JOHN DOE #1 |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos capital one bank |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom junior ormsby |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos fia card services |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom cynthia ormbsy |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos cynthia ormsby |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom occupant |
||
October 02, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos junior ormsby jd #1 |
||
September 13, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer w. Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaims |
||
September 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C SCHEDULE OF LIENORS |
||
September 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE, ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE AND LOAN MODIFICATION |
||
September 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTERS DEMAND LETTERS Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE |
||
September 05, 2023 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | ||
September 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) | ||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |